+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3-25-19
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 3/21/2019
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
March 25, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 97
March 21, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 32
May 5, 2011: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96