+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/22/2015
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/21/2015
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/20/2015
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Ref. to Local Government Committee
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/12/2015
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for adoption by Senate State& Local Gov''t Comm, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/3/2015
On January 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
On January 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments.
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (9)
April 22, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
April 22, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
April 22, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
April 22, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
April 20, 2015: LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 20, 2015: LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 12, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 8
March 3, 2015: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 3, 2015: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor