+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/21/2021
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
April 21, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 33
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor