+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/25/2017
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor