+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/17/2020
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/17/2020
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/10/2020
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/5/2019
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 2/26/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 2/26/2019
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 2/19/2019
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/5/2019
On January 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, Held on desk pending committee appointments
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On November 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
February 5, 2019: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor