+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/10/17
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/6/2017
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Calendar Committee
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
April 10, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
April 6, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 31
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor