+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 3 cal. for 3/25/2013
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for adoption by S. Comm. ref to: S. Cal. Comm.
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/21/2013
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
March 25, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
March 21, 2013: S. ED. COMM.
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor