+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
- Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/4/2019
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
April 4, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 31
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor