+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 2
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/30/17
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 28, Nays 0
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 3/27/2017
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 30, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
March 27, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 28