+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/10/13
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 4/8/2013
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
April 10, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 1
April 8, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 31