+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/22/21
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 3/18/2021
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 22, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 1
March 18, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 31
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor