+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 3
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 1/15/21
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 1/14/2021
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (6)
January 15, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 88
- Present/NV: 3
January 14, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 32
April 6, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
April 6, 2015: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
March 24, 2015: HOUSE STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 10, 2015: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor