+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 2
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3-4-19
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/28/2019
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 4, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 2
February 28, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 31
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor