+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/20/17
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 28, Nays 0
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 3/16/2017
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 20, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
March 16, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 28
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor