+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 2
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/30/15
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Rules Suspended, Adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/26/2015
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 30, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 3
March 26, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 33
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor