+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/2/15
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/1/2015
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
April 2, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 97
April 1, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor