+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/6/2015
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/6/2015
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 4/2/2015
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for adoption by Senate Commerce and Labor Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2015
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 30, 2015: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Commerce and Labor Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
March 30, 2015: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Commerce and Labor Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor