+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Ayes 23, Nays 0
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 3/5/2015
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
March 5, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 23
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor