+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/2/2018
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
April 2, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 32
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor