+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/23/2017
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for adoption by Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/20/2017
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., & Nat. Resources Committee
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (4)
March 23, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 9
March 23, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR
- Yeas: 94
March 20, 2017: SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
March 20, 2017: SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9