+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0
On June 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 6/11/2020
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On June 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
June 11, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 30
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor