+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 88, Nays 0
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar 3 for 4/19/2013
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Ref. to Education Committee
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 2/19/2013
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 2/11/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for adoption by S. Comm. ref to: S. Cal. Comm.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 2/6/2013
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
On January 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (5)
April 19, 2013: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
April 19, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 88
February 19, 2013: EDUCATION COMMITTEE
February 11, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 33
February 6, 2013: S. ED. COMM.
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor