+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 93, Nays 0
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/18/13
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 3/14/2013
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
March 18, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 2
March 14, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 31
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor