+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 1
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2-18-19
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/14/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (4)
February 18, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 1
February 18, 2019: HOUSE FLOOR SESSION: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 1
February 14, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 32
February 14, 2019: SEN. FLOOR SESSION: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 32
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor