+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 2/12/2018
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
February 12, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 31
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor