+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/25/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/19/2019
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 25, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 9
March 19, 2019: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor