+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 93, Nays 0
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/16/15
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 3/12/2015
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 16, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 1
March 12, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 33
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor