+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On June 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On June 19, 2020 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0
On June 18, 2020 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 6/18/20
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 6/18/2020
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
June 19, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 4 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
June 18, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 28
+ − Sponsors (2)
Johnson
Type:
Primary Sponsor