+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
- Adopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 1/17/2018
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
January 17, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 29
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor