+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 3/2/2020
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
March 2, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 31
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor