+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On June 11, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 6/10/20
On June 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Rules Suspended, Adopted voice vote
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
June 10, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 89
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor