+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2/6/17
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 2/2/2017
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
February 6, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
February 2, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 31
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor