+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On June 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On June 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On June 8, 2020 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
On June 4, 2020 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 6/8/20
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On June 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 6/4/2020
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On June 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On May 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
June 8, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
June 4, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 32
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor