+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Concurred, Ayes 90, Nays 1, PNV 3
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/1/2021
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 2/25/2021
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
February 25, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 32
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor