+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 3
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/9/15
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 23, Nays 0
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 3/5/2015
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 3
March 5, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 23
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor