+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in State Committee
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Committee for 5/27/2020
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/17/2020
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Action def. in State Committee to 3/17/2020
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/10/2020
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/3/2020
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., ref. to State Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/18/2019
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/12/2019
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
March 3, 2020: HOUSE DEPARTMENTS & AGENCIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee
March 18, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 8
March 12, 2019: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor