+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 5/8/2017
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
May 8, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 31
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor