+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 3 cal. for 3/25/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for adoption by S. Comm. ref to: S. Cal. Comm.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Jud. Comm.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
March 25, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
March 19, 2013: S. JUD COMM.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor