+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On November 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On November 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On November 9, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On November 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On October 29, 2021 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. #2 for 10/29/21
- Concurred, Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0
On October 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On October 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 10/29/2021
On October 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
+ − Votes (2)
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 87
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 31
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor