+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On November 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by Governor without signature.
On November 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On November 9, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On November 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On October 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 10/29/2021
- Adopted, Ayes 24, Nays 6
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On October 29, 2021 in the House:
- H. subst. HJR 9005 for SJR 9005
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA9023)
- Concurred as am., Ayes 64, Nays 17, PNV 3
On October 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendment #1
On October 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 10/28/2021
- Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
On October 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED MOTION TO CONCUR
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 3
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 1 BY RAGAN MOTION TO CONCUR
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 14
October 28, 2021: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor