+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/21/16
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Rules Suspended, Adopted voice vote
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/15/2016
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 21, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
March 15, 2016: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9