+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 5
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3-18-19
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/14/2019
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 18, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 5
March 14, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 32