+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Concurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/4/2021
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/1/2021
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/24/2021
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/17/2021
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
March 4, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
March 1, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 9
February 24, 2021: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor