+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/26/15
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 3/19/2015
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 26, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
March 19, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor