+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 86, Nays 5, PNV 2
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2015
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/21/2015
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/14/2015
- Ref. to Education Administration & Planning
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Delayed Bills Comm.
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 4/9/2015
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Ayes 29, Nays 2, PNV 1
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Ref. to Delayed Bill Committee
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/26/2015
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 3/26/2015
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/23/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/18/2015
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Education Committee
- Recalled from Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (9)
April 22, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 22, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 22, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR
- Present/NV: 2
April 22, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 14, 2015: EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 14, 2015: EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 14, 2015: EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 26, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
March 18, 2015: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: recomend for adoption
- Yeas: 9