+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 23, Nays 9, PNV 1
- Amendment tabled (Amendment 3 - SA0210)
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0209)
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0090)
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/30/2015
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Senate Reset on calendar for 3/30/2015
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/26/2015
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 2 PNV 0
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee calendar for 3/17/2015
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/4/2015
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (26)
+ − Votes (6)
March 30, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE AMEND# 3 BY Harris
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
March 30, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
March 17, 2015: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 2 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
March 17, 2015: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 2 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
March 4, 2015: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
March 4, 2015: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1