+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 28
- Effective date(s) 03/29/2017
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0052)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0063)
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/6/2017
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/1/2017
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/1/2017
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/22/2017
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 16, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
March 6, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 7
March 1, 2017: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor