+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 562
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/29/2021
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/28/2021
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/28/2021
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/26/2021
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/26/2021
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/19/2021
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/13/2021
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/6/2021
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/6/2021
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/30/2021
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/30/2021
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/24/2021
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/24/2021
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/23/2021
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
April 13, 2021: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE:
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor