+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Failed in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/4/2017
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/4/2017
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/3/2017
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/4/2017
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/28/2017
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 4, 2017: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 3