+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Failed In S. E,A&NR Comm. due to lack of motion.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. E,A&NR Comm. cal. for 3/20/2013
- Action Def. in S. E,A&NR Comm. to 3/20/2013
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. E,A&NR Comm. cal. for 3/13/2013
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. E,A&NR Comm.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor